none

# Maths Homepage

## Bookmarks

### Websites

## Plain sticky notes

### Hello World!

Hello, And welcome to the fantastic website for MATHS! This website will help you with your maths, there will be some usefull links if you head over to the Websites! -------------------------------------------------->

### Learn more tricks at our Trick Page!

Go to our Maths Tricks page!

## Photos

### HTC

This is the school Logo!

# Calender!

## Calendars

### Calendar

- Thu October 4 - Lunchtime: Buy a new beanie hat

- Fri October 5 - 6pm: Go rollerblading

- Tue June 11 - My Birthday!!

# Maths Tricks

## Plain sticky notes

### Trick 1

If you multiply 1089 x 9 you get 9801. It's reversed itself! This also works with 10989 or 109989 or 1099989 and so on.

### Trick 4

This is the 7-11-13 trick. Ask a friend to write down any 3 digit number and say multiply it by x7 then x11 then x13. eg: 884x7x11x13 And the answer is simple! 884884!

### Trick 2

Step1: Think of a number. Step2: Multiply it by 3. Step3: Add 6 with the getting result. Step4: divide it by 3. Step5: Subtract it from the first number used. Your answer is 2

### Trick 5

Coming soon.

### Trick 3

Okay theres an easy way of multiplying 11! Look: 11x52 5 (5+2=7) 2 Your answer is 572 11x63 6 (6+3) 3 Your answer is 693

# About my page!

## Plain sticky notes

### Sticky note

This page will help people out with their maths, I found some useful links and some tricks that you can use. I have found some games also feel free to play them! - Tommy

# Multplying by 11

## Plain sticky notes

### Multiplying by 11

Okay theres an easy way of multiplying 11! Look: 11x52 5 (5+2=7) 2 Your answer is 572 11x63 6 (6+3) 3 Your answer is 693

## Photos

# Clocks

# Work Out Fractions/Decimals

## Plain sticky notes

### Fraction

to work out fractions of numbers you have to devide the number by the denominator. then times it by the numerator. for you, you would do: 21/3 = 7 7x1= 7 7 is 1/3 of 21.

### decimals

If you are working out decimals like 1.5 x 2.5 First do 15 x 25 = 375 add the decimal points :) 3.75